FL S1198 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public meetings requirements for portions of meetings of the Community Violence Task Force during which exempt or confidential and exempt information is discussed; requiring the recording and transcription of exempt portions of such meetings; providing an exemption from public records requirements for such recordings and transcripts; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Meetings and Public Records/Community Violence Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1196 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H1093 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H1093 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1198 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1198/BillText/Filed/HTML |