FL S1202 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-196
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-196
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring counties and municipalities to provide a partial or a full discount on park entrance fees to military members, veterans, and the spouse and parents of certain deceased military members, law enforcement officers, firefighters, emergency medical technicians, and paramedics; requiring certain regional transportation authorities to provide a partial or a full discount on fares for certain disabled veterans, etc.
Title
Discounts on Public Park Entrance Fees and Transportation Fares
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#775 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Chapter No. 2016-196 | |
2016-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | House | Substituted for HB 1321 |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | House | Received |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | In Messages |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/18/16 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/04/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/19/16, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1202 (Ch. 2016-196)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 58 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 0447 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |