FL S1202 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Missing Child Identification Program to be administered by the Attorney General; requiring the Attorney General, or a specified entity if directed by the Attorney General, to provide the Department of Education with identification kits; requiring the department to distribute the identification kits to all students enrolled in grade 1; providing that a parent or person who has legal custody of a child may use and retain custody of the kit and may submit it to certain law enforcement agencies if the child is reported missing, etc.
Title
Missing Child Identification
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Simon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1073 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1202 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1202/BillText/Filed/HTML |