FL S1218 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Education to implement the Reigniting Education Achievement with Coordinated Help (REACH) Program as a public-private partnership in the lowest-performing public schools; specifying services to be offered with the goal of improving student academic achievement, etc.
Title
Community Schools Initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1059 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1218 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1218/BillText/Filed/HTML |