FL S1258 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 4163 -SJ 789
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 4163 -SJ 789
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to the requirement for athletic trainers and massage therapists to complete education on the modes of transmission, infection control procedures, clinical management, and prevention of human immunodeficiency virus and acquired immune deficiency syndrome, etc.
Title
Education for Athletic Trainers and Massage Therapists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 4163 -SJ 789 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 2nd time -SJ 789 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/12 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-16 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/21/12, 3:45 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-09 | Now in Budget -SJ 484 | |
2012-02-09 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 484 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, 02/09/12, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-03 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, 02/08/12, 3:45 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered | |
2012-01-31 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2012-01-31 | Now in Budget | |
2012-01-27 | CS by Health Regulation read 1st time -SJ 288 | |
2012-01-26 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-25 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 280 | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/25/12, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced -SJ 139 | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 139 | |
2011-12-13 | Filed |