FL S1268 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Florida Building Commission to adopt certain regulations and standards; providing for the incorporation of certain codes into the Florida Building Code, etc.
Title
Tiny Homes
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H801 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1268 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1268/BillText/Filed/HTML |