FL S1280 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Chief Inspector General is responsible for all agency inspectors general, including cabinet agencies and the Executive Office of the Governor. Requires the agency inspector general to keep the Chief Inspector General informed of any agency fraud, abuses, or deficiencies and authorizes the inspector general to not inform the agency head under certain circumstances. Revises the definition of "independent contractor" under the state Whistle-blower's Act to include anyone who receives public funds, etc.
Title
Inspectors General
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 95 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 95 | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0903 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 3187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3189 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 31895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 31901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 2015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1280 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1280/BillText/Filed/HTML |