FL S1280 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising definitions of the terms "normal retirement date" and "vested" or "vesting"; requiring new employees to, by default, be enrolled in the investment plan; extending the period during which employees may elect to participate in the pension plan; prohibiting certain employees from choosing to move to the pension plan after a certain period, etc.
Title
Florida Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced -SJ 140 | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 140 | |
2011-12-14 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 4501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1280 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1280/BillText/Filed/HTML |