FL S1280 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the requirement for mandatory retention of a third grade student based on his or her performance on the English Language Arts assessment, etc.
Title
Mandatory Retention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Education |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/21/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Discussed/Workshop |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H131 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1280 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1280/BillText/Filed/HTML |