FL S1280 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the task force within the Legislature for a specified purpose; requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Governmental Accountability to provide research services to the task force; providing for membership, meetings, and duties of the task force; requiring the task force to submit a report to the Governor and the Legislature by a specified date, etc.
Title
Public Health Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1413 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1280 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1280/BillText/Filed/HTML |