FL S1336 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Chief Financial Officer to set the rate of interest payable by eligible institutions on interest on trust accounts quarterly, effective on specified dates; providing that the percentage yield of such rate may not exceed a specified threshold; requiring the Chief Financial Officer to inform Funding Florida Legal Aid of the rate established for the quarter; requiring that such institutions submit to Funding Florida Legal Aid a certain form promulgated by The Florida Bar, etc.
Title
Interest on Trust Accounts
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Grall [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 2 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1253 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee