FL S1344 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting an operator of a place of entertainment or the operator's agent from restricting the resale of tickets, denying access to a ticket holder, or using a paperless ticketing system under certain circumstances; prohibiting an operator or an operator's agent from selling or conveying tickets to a secondary ticket seller owned or controlled by the operator or the operator's agent, etc.
Title
Resale of Tickets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2016-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/08/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1127 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1344 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1344/BillText/Filed/HTML |