FL S1354 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7003 -SJ 790
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7003 -SJ 790
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Environmental Protection, in coordination with the water management districts, to adopt statewide environmental resource permitting rules for activities relating to the management and storage of surface waters; preserving an exemption from causes of action under the "Bert J. Harris, Jr., Private Property Rights Protection Act"; requiring counties, municipalities, and delegated local pollution control programs to incorporate by reference certain rules; requiring counties, municipalities, and delegated local pollution control programs to amend ordinances and regulations within a specified timeframe to incorporate applicable rules; providing a presumption of compliance for specified design, construction, operation, and maintenance of certain stormwater management systems; providing exemptions for specified stormwater management systems and permitted activities, etc.
Title
Environmental Resource Permitting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7003 -SJ 790 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 2nd time -SJ 790 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/12 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-23 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 556 | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations read 1st time -SJ 333 | |
2012-02-03 | Now in Budget -SJ 325 | |
2012-02-02 | CS by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations, 02/02/12, 8:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Budget -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-24 | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-19 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/24/12, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced -SJ 146 | |
2012-01-13 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 146 | |
2011-12-22 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 4131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |