FL S1378 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1604 (Ch. 2016-212)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1604 (Ch. 2016-212)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as "Victoria's Law"; requiring pharmacies to offer for sale prescription lock boxes; authorizing the Department of Health to develop and distribute a pamphlet containing certain information, etc.
Title
Drug Safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1604 (Ch. 2016-212) |
2016-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2016-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/16 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/29/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/24/16, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-02 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/01/16, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1329 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1604 (Ch. 2016-212)
S1604 (Similar To) 2016-04-08 - Chapter No. 2016-212
S1604 (Similar To) 2016-04-08 - Chapter No. 2016-212