FL S1388 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1287 -SJ 1270
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1287 -SJ 1270
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the application forms for motor vehicle registration and renewal of registration to include language permitting the applicant to make a voluntary contribution to Autism Services and Supports and to Support Our Troops; providing that such contributions are not income for specified purposes; requiring the application forms for an original, renewal, or replacement driver license or identification card to include language permitting the applicant to make a voluntary contribution to Autism Services and Supports and to Support Our Troops; providing that such contributions are not income for specified purposes, etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration Forms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1287 -SJ 1270 | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time -SJ 1270 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/12 | |
2012-03-07 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 956 | |
2012-02-29 | Now in Budget -SJ 721 | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations, 02/28/12, 2:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Transportation read 1st time -SJ 306 | |
2012-01-31 | Now in Budget | |
2012-01-30 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-26 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/26/12, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced -SJ 150 | |
2012-01-13 | Referred to Transportation; Budget -SJ 150 | |
2012-01-03 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |