FL S1414 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that any person who drives any vehicle at or above a specified speed commits reckless driving; revising the threshold above the posted speed limit at which a person in violation of certain provisions must be cited for a moving violation, etc.
Title
Driving Over the Speed Limit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1297 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 1926 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 0261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |