FL S1436 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 615
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 615
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing the Statewide Council on Human Trafficking with an additional duty; requiring the direct support organization of the Statewide Council on Human Trafficking to develop certain training for firesafety inspectors; requiring foster parents and agency staff to complete preservice and inservice training related to human trafficking, etc.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 615 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 615 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/16/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-03 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H615 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-168
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 617 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 618 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |