FL S1472 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a disabled parking permit to display the applicant's driver license or identification card photograph; providing an exemption; specifying the amount of a civil penalty for certain violations, etc.
Title
Disabled Parking Permits
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1107 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
318 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1472 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1472/BillText/Filed/HTML |