FL S1558 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to design and issue a sticker for use as a parking permit in lieu of a placard, etc.
Title
Parking Permits for Persons with Mobility Impairment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/09/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/03/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1325 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1558 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1558/BillText/Filed/HTML |