FL S1590 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting adults from offering to commit, committing, or engaging in prostitution, lewdness, or assignation; providing criminal penalties; prohibiting the owning, establishing, maintaining, operating, using, letting, or renting of a building, residence, place, or structure, in whole or in part, or a trailer or any other conveyance, with knowledge or reckless disregard that it will be used for the purpose of commercial sex; prohibiting the receiving, or offering or agreeing to receive, a person into a building, residence, place, or structure, or a trailer or any other conveyance, for the purpose of commercial sexual activity or to allow a person to remain there for such purpose, etc.
Title
Prostitution and Related Acts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2024-02-01 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1385 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 417 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
60 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
772 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
895 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |