FL S1600 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing requirements for the applicable board, or the Department of Business and Professional Regulation if there is no board, relating to licensure by reciprocity and by endorsement; requiring the respective boards of occupations, or the Department of Business and Professional Regulation if there is no board, to allow licensure by endorsement if applicant meets certain criteria; requiring the department, and authorizing the board, as applicable, to review the results of the criminal history checks according to specified criteria to determine if the applicants meet the requirements for licensure; designating the "Mobile Opportunity by Interstate Licensure Endorsement Act" or the "MOBILE Act", etc.
Title
Interstate Mobility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#927 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#37 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#37 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-01 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 32 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (621154, 648528) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Now in Regulated Industries |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Regulated Industries; Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1381 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce Committee
H1273 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
H975 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S7016 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-15
H1273 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
H975 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S7016 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-15
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
455 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 2135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
457 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
467 | 0125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
490 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |