FL S1612 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for specified records that have been approved for nonjudicial expunction; providing an exemption from public records requirements for criminal history records related to a withhold of adjudication that have been expunged; providing an exemption from public records requirements for a record related to a withhold of adjudication or nonviolent misdemeanor conviction that has been approved for a nonjudicial sealing; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemptions; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Criminal History Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/07/15, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Fiscal Policy |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0488 (Related) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H7107 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H7105 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H7107 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H7105 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
943 | 0584 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1612 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1612/BillText/Filed/HTML |