FL S1614 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Excluding manmade lakes and lagoons over a certain size from the definitions of the terms "public swimming pool" and "swimming pool," respectively, for certain purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lakes and Lagoons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-18SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-18SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Rules
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H757 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
514011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51525Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback