FL S1624 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "flea market"; prohibiting a person from willfully selling, exchanging, or donating, or offering for sale, exchange, or donation a dog or cat at a flea market; providing exceptions; establishing criminal penalties; establishing enhanced criminal penalties for certain violations, etc.
Title
Sale of Dogs or Cats
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-04-11 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/10/14, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1377 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
828 | 291 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |