FL S1672 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 813
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 813
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring securities dealers, investment advisers, and associated persons to immediately report knowledge or suspicion of abuse, neglect, or exploitation of vulnerable adults to the Department of Children and Families' central abuse hotline; authorizing dealers and investment advisers to delay disbursements or transactions of funds or securities from certain accounts associated with specified adults if certain conditions are met; providing for administrative and civil immunity for dealers, investment advisers, and associated persons, etc.
Title
Protection of Vulnerable Investors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 813 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 813 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-13 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/28/20, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H813 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-157
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 1034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |