FL S1700 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing persons who hold vehicle for-hire licenses issued by any county or municipality in this state to perform work in any county or municipality in this state, regardless of additional licensing requirements, under certain circumstances; authorizing persons who hold vehicle for-hire airport permits to perform work at any airport regardless of additional airport permit requirements, etc.
Title
Vehicle For-hire Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H807 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1700 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1700/BillText/Filed/HTML |