FL S1702 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to authorize the proposal and enactment of legislation by initiative and to provide for Supreme Court review of initiative petitions proposing legislation, etc.
Title
Legislation by Initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H613 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1702 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1702/BillText/Filed/HTML |