FL S1794 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died, not introduced, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8023 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died, not introduced, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8023 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 28, 2017, as "Florida Gulf Coast University Day" in Florida and commemorating the university's 20th anniversary, etc.
Title
Florida Gulf Coast University Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died, not introduced, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8023 (Adopted) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H8023 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Adopted by Publication
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1794 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1794/BillText/Filed/HTML |