FL S1806 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00855; Substituted HB 7037 -SJ 00855; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 00855
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00855; Substituted HB 7037 -SJ 00855; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 00855
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Redefines and deletes terms relating to vocational rehabilitation programs. Revises provisions relating to eligibility for vocational rehabilitation services. Requires the Division of Vocational Rehabilitation in the DOE to conduct trial work experiences before determining that an individual is incapable of benefiting from services. Requires the division to administer an independent living program, etc.
Title
Education [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00855; Substituted HB 7037 -SJ 00855; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 00855 | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable by- Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00551; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00551 | |
2010-04-09 | Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Now in Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 412-K | |
2010-04-07 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-06 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00542 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 04/06/10, 1:00 pm, 301-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Rules -SJ 00123 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Rules | |
2010-02-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7053 (Similar To) 2010-04-07 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 4; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22), HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70) -HJ 00615
H7189 (Similar To) 2010-04-07 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 6 (Vetoed by Governor); Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70) -HJ 00618
S0004 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Chapter No. 2010-22, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70)
S0006 (Similar To) 2010-07-20 - Veto Message received (2010-C) -SJ 00003; Veto Message referred to Rules -SJ 00005
S1412 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-102; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 851 (Ch. 2010-221), CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225), HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), HB 7131 (Ch. 2010-117), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
H7037 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-70; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H7189 (Similar To) 2010-04-07 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 6 (Vetoed by Governor); Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70) -HJ 00618
S0004 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Chapter No. 2010-22, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70)
S0006 (Similar To) 2010-07-20 - Veto Message received (2010-C) -SJ 00003; Veto Message referred to Rules -SJ 00005
S1412 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-102; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 851 (Ch. 2010-221), CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225), HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), HB 7131 (Ch. 2010-117), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
H7037 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-70; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0163 | 31777 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 393 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0413 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 87 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 631 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 632 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 633 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 634 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 94 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |