FL S1808 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring managing entities to provide local workforce development boards with certain information about publicly funded providers of behavioral health services; revising penalties for noncompliance with work requirements for receipt of temporary cash assistance; limiting the receipt of child-only benefits during periods of noncompliance with work requirements; requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity, in cooperation with CareerSource Florida, Inc., and the Department of Children and Families, to inform participants in the temporary cash assistance program of work requirements and sanctions and penalties for noncompliance with work requirements, etc.
Title
Public Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1367 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 9082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1808 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1808/BillText/Filed/HTML |