FL S1870 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the Department of Health, the Department of Children and Families, the Department of Elderly Affairs, the Department of Corrections, and the Department of Education from using state or federal funds for specified purposes; creating the Florida Coordinating Council on Conversion Therapy within the Department of Health for a specified purpose; requiring the Department of Health, the Department of Children and Families, the Department of Elderly Affairs, the Department of Corrections, and the Department of Education to annually publish on their websites educational information on conversion therapy developed by the coordinating council, etc.
Title
Conversion Therapy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
402 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 891 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 892 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 893 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1870 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1870/BillText/Filed/HTML |