FL S1880 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7049 -SJ 960
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7049 -SJ 960
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Adding violations of ch. 787, F.S., to the jurisdiction of the Office of Statewide Prosecution; requiring an employee of a massage establishment and any person performing massage therein to present, upon request of an investigator, valid government identification while in the establishment; providing documentation requirements for the operator of a massage establishment; providing criminal penalties; repealing provisions relating to unlawfully obtaining labor or services; providing for forfeiture of property used, attempted to be used, or intended to be used in violation of specified human trafficking provisions; revising provisions relating to selling or buying of minors into sex trafficking or prostitution, etc.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7049 -SJ 960 | |
2012-03-08 | Read 3rd time -SJ 960 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 890 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/12 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 722 | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 -SJ 722 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/28/12, 4:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time -SJ 338 | |
2012-02-03 | Now in Budget | |
2012-02-02 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | |
2012-01-26 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/31/12, 15 Minutes after recess of session, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 245 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 245 | |
2012-01-09 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 0535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
772 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
895 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
905 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |