FL S1884 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 517 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 517 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amending provisions relating to exclusions from part II of ch. 83, F.S., the Florida Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; requiring a licensed facility to report certain peer review information and final disciplinary actions to the Division of Medical Quality Assurance of the Department of Health rather than the Division of Health Quality Assurance of the Agency for Health Care Administration; requiring each applicant for initial licensure, change of ownership, or license renewal to operate a licensed home medical equipment provider at a location outside the state to submit documentation of accreditation, or an application for accreditation, from an accrediting organization that is recognized by the Agency for Health Care Administration, etc.
Title
Health Regulation by the Agency for Health Care Administration
Sponsors
Senate Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | Sen. Rene Garcia [R] | Senate Health Regulation Committee |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 517 (Ch. | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/12 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 874 | |
2012-03-01 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations read 1st time -SJ 758 | |
2012-03-01 | Now in Budget -SJ 743 | |
2012-02-28 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 743 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, 02/28/12, 10:45 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-22 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2012-02-22 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 674 | |
2012-02-14 | Now in Budget | |
2012-02-14 | Original reference(s) removed: Banking and Insurance | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Health Regulation read 1st time -SJ 339 | |
2012-02-02 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | |
2012-01-26 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/31/12, 15 minutes after adjournment, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 245 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Health Regulation; Banking and Insurance -SJ 245 | |
2012-01-09 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 0455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 0161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 0193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 3025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 3036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 3037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 4025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 1183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 462 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 464 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 474 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 484 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 931 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 7056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 8065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 810 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 813 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 91195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 294 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 294 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |