FL S1976 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00995; Amendment(s) adopted (925538, 849614, 815508, 587724, 342988) -SJ 00996; Substituted CS/HB 7157 -SJ 00996; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 109 (Ch. 2010-32), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90) -SJ 00996
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00995; Amendment(s) adopted (925538, 849614, 815508, 587724, 342988) -SJ 00996; Substituted CS/HB 7157 -SJ 00996; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 109 (Ch. 2010-32), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90) -SJ 00996
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the duration of liens securing the payment of unemployment compensation tax obligations. Provides that the tax on deeds and other instruments relating to real property does not apply to property sold pursuant to a short sale. Provides that an exemption from the communications services tax does not apply to transient public lodging establishments, etc.
Title
Department of Revenue [WPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00995; Amendment(s) adopted (925538, 849614, 815508, 587724, 342988) -SJ 00996; Substituted CS/HB 7157 -SJ 00996; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 109 (Ch. 2010-32), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90) -SJ 00996 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-27 | Withdrawn from Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00920; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-26 | Withdrawn from General Government Appropriations -SJ 00863; Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-21 | Withdrawn from Finance and Tax -SJ 00701; Now in General Government Appropriations | |
2010-04-08 | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance -SJ 00523; Now in Finance and Tax | |
2010-03-08 | Now in Banking and Insurance -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-04 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Commerce (342988); YEAS 9 NAYS 1 -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Banking and Insurance; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00133; On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 03/03/10, 3:15 pm, 401-S | |
2010-02-26 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 03/03/10, 3:15 pm, 401-S | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Commerce; Banking and Insurance; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-02-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0109 (Similar To) 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-32; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138)
S0234 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00789; Substituted CS/HB 109 -SJ 00789; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 109 (Ch. 2010-32), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138) -SJ 00789
S1412 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-102; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 851 (Ch. 2010-221), CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225), HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), HB 7131 (Ch. 2010-117), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
H7061 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
H5801 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-166; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138)
H7157 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-138; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 109 (Ch. 2010-32), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
S1736 (Similar To) 2010-05-17 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-90; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7033 (Ch. 2010-1), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138)
S0234 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00789; Substituted CS/HB 109 -SJ 00789; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 109 (Ch. 2010-32), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138) -SJ 00789
S1412 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-102; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 851 (Ch. 2010-221), CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225), HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), HB 7131 (Ch. 2010-117), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
H7061 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
H5801 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-166; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138)
H7157 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-138; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 109 (Ch. 2010-32), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
S1736 (Similar To) 2010-05-17 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-90; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7033 (Ch. 2010-1), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0055 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0095 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0195 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0201 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0202 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0213 | 0532 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0213 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0213 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0213 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0213 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0213 | 692 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0213 | 758 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0220 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0336 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 1215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 1316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 163 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |