FL S2014 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that a nursing home and an assisted living facility allow a resident, the resident's personal representative at the resident's request, the resident's surrogate, or the resident's guardian to monitor the room of the resident through the use of electronic monitoring devices; providing that a nursing home and an assisted living facility require a resident who conducts electronic monitoring, or the resident's personal representative, surrogate, or guardian, to post notice of the monitoring on the hall door of the resident's room; requiring that written consent be obtained from the resident, or from the resident's personal representative, surrogate, or guardian, on a form provided by the Agency for Health Care Administration before an employee, officer, or other agent of the nursing home or the assisted living facility intentionally hampers, obstructs, tampers with, or destroys an electronic monitoring device installed in a resident's room, etc.
Title
Electronic Monitoring Devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs | |
2012-01-20 | Introduced -SJ 254 | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 254 | |
2012-01-10 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/2014 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/2014/BillText/Filed/HTML |