FL S2294 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the requirements for eligibility to receive benefits. Prohibits a determination of ineligibility based solely on the fact that the individual is available only for part-time work. Provides for an alternative base period under certain circumstances. Prohibits a determination of ineligibility based solely on the fact that the individual is available only for part-time work, etc.
Title
Unemployment Compensation [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Commerce, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90) | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00197 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Commerce; Finance and Tax; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00197 | |
2010-02-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0741 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA)
S1736 (Similar To) 2010-05-17 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-90; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7033 (Ch. 2010-1), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138)
S1736 (Similar To) 2010-05-17 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-90; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7033 (Ch. 2010-1), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0443 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 1216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0443 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |