FL S7010 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amending a provision which provides a public records exemption for the identification and location information of servicemembers and the spouses and dependents of servicemembers; narrowing the exemption by requiring the servicemember to have been deployed to overseas service for the United States Department of Defense; revising the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.
Title
OGSR/Servicemembers and the Spouses and Dependents of Servicemembers
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Senate Military and Veterans Affairs and Space Committee |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1 411 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/12/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/29/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/13/20, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Filed |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 11/13/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space |
Same As/Similar To
H7027 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar