FL S7026 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Management Services to ensure that a health maintenance organization under contract with the department provides reasonable access to certain services to persons younger than 21 years of age; specifying provisions that must be included in a contract between the department and a health maintenance organization, etc.
Title
State Group Insurance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/17/15, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |