FL S7026 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Chapter No. 2022-145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Chapter No. 2022-145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the Department of Management Services, rather than the Division of State Group Insurance, as the entity that contracts for dependent eligibility verification services for the state group insurance program; authorizing the department or the contractor providing dependent eligibility verification services to require certain information from subscribers; revising the types of information that the department or a contractor providing eligibility verification services may require from subscribers in order to establish dependent eligibility for the state group insurance program, etc.
Title
OGSR/Dependent Eligibility Verification Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#726 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#726 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Chapter No. 2022-145 | |
2022-05-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-25 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (344275) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | In returning messages |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Amendment 344275 adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 1443 |
2022-02-28 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/27/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Filed |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
Same As/Similar To
H1443 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 7026
H1445 (Similar To) 2022-05-04 - Chapter No. 2022-86
S1660 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S1662 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H1445 (Similar To) 2022-05-04 - Chapter No. 2022-86
S1660 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S1662 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability