FL S7076 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Chapter No. 2016-218
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Chapter No. 2016-218
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Fixing the date for convening the 2018 Regular Session of the Legislature, etc.
Title
Legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#820 (Y: 89 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Chapter No. 2016-218 | |
2016-04-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-25 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed; YEAS 89 NAYS 28 |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | House | Substituted for HB 7103 |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | House | Received |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 27 NAYS 11 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/29/16, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/16/16, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Ethics and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
H7103 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7076 (Ch. 2016-218)