GA HB1019 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to reincorporate the City of Doraville in the County of DeKalb, approved October 13, 1971 (Ga. L. 1971, Ex. Sess., p. 2154), as amended, so as to provide for the filling of vacancies in the offices of mayor and councilmember; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Dekalb County; City of Doraville; filling of vacancies in offices of mayor and councilmember; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Simone Bell [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Rep. Tom Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #515 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Vote #500 - Loc Calendar W/e Hb 905 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Vote #500 - Loc Calendar W/e Hb 905 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 503 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-21 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-16 | House First Readers |