GA HB1027 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to competencies and core curriculum under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide that beginning in the 2026-2027 school year at least a half-credit computer science course shall be a high school graduation requirement; to require that such course shall not include virtual or remote instruction, subject to an exception; to provide for such exception; to revise legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Quality Basic Education Act; half-credit computer science course shall be a high school graduation requirement; require in 2026-2027 school year
Sponsors
Rep. Bethany Ballard [R] | Rep. Todd Jones [R] | Rep. Chris Erwin [R] | Rep. Matt Dubnik [R] |
Rep. Mitchell Horner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-24 | House | House Hopper |