GA HB1028 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - Veto V9
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - Veto V9
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding ad valorem taxation of property, so as to revise and change certain provisions regarding ad valorem taxation of forest land conservation use property; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; forest land conservation use property; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Benfield [D] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Larry O'Neal [R] |
Rep. DuBose Porter [D] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #714 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House Vote #580 - Pass (Y: 139 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House Vote #580 - Pass (Y: 139 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | Veto V9 | |
2010-06-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-02-17 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-17 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-04 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-02 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-01 | House First Readers |