GA HB1052 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to crimes and offenses, so as to create the offense of murder in the second degree; to change provisions relating to murder; to provide for penalties; to amend Titles 15, 16, and 31, Code Section 35-3-190, Title 42, and Code Section 49-2-14.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to courts, crimes and offenses, health, the state-wide alert system for unapprehended murder or rape suspects determined to be serious public threats, penal institutions, and records check requirements for the Department of Human Services, respectively, so as to correct cross-references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; create offense of murder in the second degree; change provisions relating to murder
Sponsors
Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. LaDawn Jones [D] | Rep. Dustin Hightower [R] |
Rep. B.J. Pak [R] | Rep. Simone Bell [D] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #695 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-20 | House | House Hopper |