GA HB1065 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alcoholic beverages, so as to change certain provisions relating to tax payment and reporting by licensees; to provide a date by which taxes must be paid for distilled spirits sold by the package or disposed of by wholesale dealers; to provide for electronic record keeping; to declare certain distilled spirits to be contraband; to change certain provisions relating to authorization of the levy of tax on the sale of distilled spirits by the package and imposition of tax by both counties and municipalities; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; tax payment and reporting by licensees; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #582 - Passage (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-21 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-17 | House First Readers |