GA HB1091 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the chief magistrate of Clayton County, approved March 21, 1984 (Ga. L. 1984, p. 4411), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 4, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4136), so as to revise provisions regarding compensation of the chief magistrate; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clayton County; compensation of chief magistrate; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Yasmin Neal [D] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] | Rep. El-Mahdi Holly [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] |
Rep. Eric Bell [D] | Sen. Valencia Seay [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #646 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #440 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #440 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-08 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2024-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-30 | House | House Hopper |