GA HB1129 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create the McPherson Implementing Local Redevelopment Authority, approved May 14, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 4328), so as to continue such authority; to provide for extended contract and lease periods with respect to projects; to provide for public contracts with private enterprises for the completion of projects; to revise provisions relating to absences from board meetings; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"McPherson Implementing Local Redevelopment Authority Act"; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] | Rep. Howard Mosby [D] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Rep. Park Cannon [D] |
Rep. Taylor Bennett [D] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #656 (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Vote #739 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Vote #739 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 329 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-03-14 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-08 | House | House Hopper |