GA HB1174 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of maintenance and use of public roads, so as to provide for regulation of oversize and overweight loads on streets or highways; to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for a definition; to provide for vehicles approaching an intersection with a pedestrian hybrid beacon; to provide that evidence obtained by speed detection devices in a variable speed zone is inadmissible; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public roads; regulate oversize and overweight loads; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Sen. Hardie Davis [D] | Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. Robert Lane [R] |
Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Rep. Donna Sheldon [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #787 - Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-24 | Act 460 | |
2010-05-24 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-16 | House First Readers |