GA HB1193 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "Monroe County Public Facilities Authority Act," approved May 14, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 4432), so as to repeal certain provisions limiting such authority's authority to issue revenue bonds to four years; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Monroe County Public Facilities Authority Act; limiting authority to issue revenue bonds to four years; repeal certain provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #622 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #622 - Local Calendar (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #622 - Local Calendar (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 524 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-07 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-05 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-29 | House First Readers |