GA HB1195 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the office of commissioner of Chattooga County, approved March 6, 1956 (Ga. L. 1956, p. 2899), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 20, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 4002), so as to revise the compensation of the commissioner of Chattooga County; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chattooga County; revise compensation of commissioner
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #614 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #622 - Local Calendar (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #622 - Local Calendar (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 525 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-07 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-05 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-29 | House First Readers |